Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2058.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | Read first time. To print. |