|
09/27/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 3360.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2629.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 2059.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|