Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1989.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | Read first time. To print. |