07/06/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2023. | |||
07/06/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/03/2023 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1682.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1011.) | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | Read first time. To print. |