California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2023

Amended

Bill June 15, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023