|
07/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1828.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1363.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|