Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2022 | Introduced. To print. |