California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB624 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023