|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 2454.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 2062.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|