California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024
Bill September 6, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023