California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB676 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Amended

Bill August 21, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023