|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 3476.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2706.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 1693.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|