Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/09/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 8. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2022 | Introduced. To print. |