Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1805.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|