|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3172.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2395.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1745.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2023
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/13/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/12/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|