|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3467.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3322.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2585.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1273.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|