|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 454, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3285.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2582.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1864.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure version as amended on April 19 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.M. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|