Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wilk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|