California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill August 16, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023
Bill June 22, 2023
Bill June 7, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023