California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023