Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/14/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 13. | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2022 | Introduced. To print. |