Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Jackson. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | Read first time. To print. |