|
09/23/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3535.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 2727.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 1485.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|