Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 11). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | Read first time. To print. |