|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 933, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3883.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|