California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB777 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2023

Amended

Bill June 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023