|
09/23/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 10. Page 3021.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1300.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|