Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 2144.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Measure version as amended on April 19 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|