Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1916.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|