California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill August 14, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023