Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 2. Page 3944.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3805.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2023
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/16/2022
|
Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/15/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|