Assembly
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1686.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|