Assembly
|
09/01/2024
|
Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1544.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|