Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1877.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | Read first time. To print. |