|
07/21/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1916.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1079.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|