California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023