Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1852.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 14). | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | Read first time. To print. |