Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|