|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2555.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 1926.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|