Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1747.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2023 | Read first time. To print. |