California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill June 19, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023