Assembly
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 3969.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|