Senate | 06/29/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1596.) | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | Read first time. To print. |