Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|