Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3192.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2486.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 1411.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|