|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Newman.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2126.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|