|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3025.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2360.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1365.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|