|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2415.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1492.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|