|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3077.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 2. Page 1298.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|