California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2023

Amended

Bill August 17, 2023
Bill July 3, 2023
Bill June 5, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023